Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Business Regulation - Business Discounts and Preferences for Veterans - Identification
Sponsored by
Senators Simonaire, Peters, Astle, Benson, Feldman, Hershey, Jennings, Kelley, Klausmeier, Mathias, Middleton, Pugh, and Reilly
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 350
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring businesses, registered with the State Department of Assessments and Taxation, that offer discounts or preferences on products or services to veterans to accept a valid driver's license or identification card with a notation of veteran status as verification of veteran status for purposes of claiming the discount or preference.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Economic Matters  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/14/2016
Legislative Date
1/15/2016
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2016
Legislative Date
1/20/2016
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2016
Legislative Date
2/08/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2016
Legislative Date
2/09/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {207175/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
19
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2016
Legislative Date
2/09/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
19
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/11/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
21
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
23
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2016
Legislative Date
3/09/2016
Action
Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/10/2016
Legislative Date
5/10/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 350
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/14/2016 1/15/2016 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/20/2016 1/20/2016 Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/05/2016 2/08/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 2/09/2016 2/09/2016 Favorable with Amendments {207175/1 Report Adopted 19
Senate 2/09/2016 2/09/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 19
Senate 2/11/2016 2/11/2016 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 21
House 2/12/2016 2/12/2016 First Reading Economic Matters 23
House 3/09/2016 3/09/2016 Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/05/2016 4/06/2016 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 4/06/2016 3/30/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 62
House 4/06/2016 3/30/2016 Second Reading Passed 62
House 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 64
Senate 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Returned Passed 62
Post Passage 5/10/2016 5/10/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 350
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM