Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Clean Water Commerce Act of 2021
Sponsored by
Senators Guzzone and Elfreth
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/28 at 11:00 a.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Clean Water Commerce Fund as a special, nonlapsing fund; requiring the Department of the Environment to transfer $20,000,000 from the Bay Restoration Fund to the Clean Water Commerce Fund for certain purposes beginning in fiscal year 2022; altering the authorized uses of the Bay Restoration Fund to include certain transfers to the Clean Water Commerce Fund; repealing a certain authorization to use funds in the Bay Restoration Fund for costs associated with certain nutrient or sediment load reductions; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0507
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2021
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/30/2020
Legislative Date
10/30/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/29/2020
Legislative Date
12/29/2020
Action
Hearing 1/21 at 11:00 a.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/05/2021
Legislative Date
1/05/2021
Action
Hearing canceled (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/05/2021
Legislative Date
1/05/2021
Action
Hearing 1/28 at 11:00 a.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Clean Water Commerce Act of 2021
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/30/2020 10/30/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Budget and Taxation
Senate 12/29/2020 12/29/2020 Hearing 1/21 at 11:00 a.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Senate 1/05/2021 1/05/2021 Hearing canceled (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Senate 1/05/2021 1/05/2021 Hearing 1/28 at 11:00 a.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Text - First - Clean Water Commerce Act of 2021
Last Updated: 1/26/2021 7:38 PM
Click to return on the top page