Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Juvenile Law - Detention - Community Detention Violation Hearings
Sponsored by
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee (By Request - Departmental - Juvenile Services)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 35
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring an intake officer who authorized detention of a child for a violation of community detention to immediately file a petition to authorize continued detention; requiring that a hearing on a specified petition be held no later than the next court day unless extended for no more than 5 days by the court on good cause shown; and requiring notice of the hearing be given to the child and, if they can be located, the child's parents, guardian, or custodian.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/18/2013
Legislative Date
11/08/2013
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/18/2013
Legislative Date
1/08/2014
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/01/2014
Legislative Date
1/01/2014
Action
Hearing 1/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/09/2014
Legislative Date
1/10/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2014
Legislative Date
1/10/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
3
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2014
Legislative Date
1/10/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
3
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/14/2014
Legislative Date
1/14/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
5
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/16/2014
Legislative Date
1/16/2014
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
7
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/05/2014
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {142418/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (131-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendment
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/08/2014
Legislative Date
4/08/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 35
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 12/18/2013 11/08/2013 Pre-filed
Senate 12/18/2013 1/08/2014 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/01/2014 1/01/2014 Hearing 1/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/09/2014 1/10/2014 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/10/2014 1/10/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 3
Senate 1/10/2014 1/10/2014 Second Reading Passed 3
Senate 1/14/2014 1/14/2014 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 5
House 1/16/2014 1/16/2014 First Reading Judiciary 7
House 3/05/2014 3/05/2014 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/28/2014 3/31/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 4/01/2014 3/25/2014 Favorable with Amendments {142418/1 Report Adopted 61
House 4/01/2014 3/25/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 61
House 4/02/2014 3/26/2014 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (131-0) 62
Senate 4/03/2014 3/25/2014 Senate Concur - House Amendment 59
Senate 4/03/2014 3/25/2014 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 59
Senate 4/03/2014 3/25/2014 Passed Enrolled 59
Post Passage 4/08/2014 4/08/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 35
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM