Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law – Comprehensive Crime Bill of 2018
Sponsored by
Senator Zirkin
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing that the use of a firearm in the commission of a felony or other crime of violence constitutes a crime of violence; expanding the list of controlled dangerous substances applicable to a certain prohibition against volume dealing; increasing maximum penalties for certain crimes; establishing the Tyrone Ray Violence Intervention and Prevention Fund to be used to support effective violence reduction strategies through grants to local communities; establishing the Task Force to Study Maryland's Criminal Gang Statutes; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Appropriations
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/11/2018
Legislative Date
1/11/2018
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Criminal Law - Obstructing Justice - Penalties
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2018
Legislative Date
1/15/2018
Action
Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2018
Legislative Date
1/22/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2018
Legislative Date
1/22/2018
Action
Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/05/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {108878/1
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Zirkin) Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/07/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {108878/1
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/07/2018
Action
Committee Amendment Adopted
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/07/2018
Action
Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Ferguson) Adopted
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/07/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/07/2018
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/8 (Senator Zirkin) Adopted
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2018
Legislative Date
3/08/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Adopted
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2018
Legislative Date
3/08/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {143322/2 (Senator Ferguson) Adopted
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2018
Legislative Date
3/08/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Criminal Law – Comprehensive Crime Bill of 2018
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (36-8)
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2018
Legislative Date
3/10/2018
Action
Referred Judiciary Appropriations
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/09/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/11/2018 1/11/2018 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Criminal Law - Obstructing Justice - Penalties
Senate 1/15/2018 1/15/2018 Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/22/2018 1/22/2018 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/22/2018 1/22/2018 Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/05/2018 3/05/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Favorable with Amendments {108878/1 40
Senate 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Motion Laid Over (Senator Zirkin) Adopted 40
Senate 3/07/2018 3/07/2018 Favorable with Amendments {108878/1 41
Senate 3/07/2018 3/07/2018 Committee Amendment Adopted 41
Senate 3/07/2018 3/07/2018 Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Ferguson) Adopted 41
Senate 3/07/2018 3/07/2018 Favorable with Amendments 41
Senate 3/07/2018 3/07/2018 Motion Special Order until 3/8 (Senator Zirkin) Adopted 41
Senate 3/08/2018 3/08/2018 Favorable with Amendments Adopted 42
Senate 3/08/2018 3/08/2018 Floor Amendment {143322/2 (Senator Ferguson) Adopted 42
Senate 3/08/2018 3/08/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 42
Text - Third - Criminal Law – Comprehensive Crime Bill of 2018
Senate 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Third Reading Passed (36-8) 44
House 3/13/2018 3/10/2018 Referred Judiciary Appropriations 44
House 3/13/2018 3/13/2018 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 4/09/2018 4/09/2018 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-402, 10-406, 12-302 )
(   14-101, 4-203, 4-204, 5-612, 5-621, 5-622, 9-302, 9-303, 9-305 )
(   11-930, 11-931 )
(   8-505, 8-506, 8-507 )
(   4-301 through 4-306, 4-801 through 4-808, 5-133 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM