Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Interstate Boating Violator Compact
Sponsored by
Senator Simonaire
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Governor to enter into the Interstate Boating Violator Compact; providing the purposes of the Compact are to provide a means for party states to participate in a specified reciprocal program and to provide for the fair and impartial treatment of boating violators operating within party states; providing for a Board of Boating Compact Administrators for specified purposes; requiring the Department of Natural Resources to adopt specified regulations; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
Contingency - on adoption of an interstate compact
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/14/2016
Legislative Date
1/15/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2016
Legislative Date
1/15/2016
Action
Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2016
Legislative Date
2/08/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2016
Legislative Date
2/09/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
19
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2016
Legislative Date
2/09/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
19
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/11/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
21
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
23
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2016
Legislative Date
3/08/2016
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/14/2016 1/15/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/15/2016 1/15/2016 Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/08/2016 2/08/2016 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/09/2016 2/09/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 19
Senate 2/09/2016 2/09/2016 Second Reading Passed 19
Senate 2/11/2016 2/11/2016 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 21
House 2/12/2016 2/12/2016 First Reading Environment and Transportation 23
House 3/08/2016 3/08/2016 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/04/2016 4/05/2016 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   8-801 through 8-804 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM