Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Election Law - Coordinated Expenditures and Donations - Investigation
Sponsored by
Senator Pinsky
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 712
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the State Administrator of Elections or the State Administrator's designee to investigate a potential violation of certain provisions of law prohibiting certain coordinated expenditures and donations; authorizing the State Administrator or designee to issue a subpoena for the attendance of a witness to testify or the production of records; requiring the State Administrator, in order for a subpoena to be issued, to make a finding that the subpoena is necessary to and in furtherance of a certain investigation; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1025
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2019
Legislative Date
1/17/2019
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Election Law - Coordinated Expenditures and Donations - Investigation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2019
Legislative Date
1/23/2019
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2019
Legislative Date
2/13/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2019
Legislative Date
2/13/2019
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2019
Legislative Date
2/13/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until 2/14 (Senator Cassilly) Adopted
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2019
Legislative Date
2/14/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2019
Legislative Date
2/14/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {623323/1 (Senator Cassilly)
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2019
Legislative Date
2/14/2019
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Ferguson) Adopted
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2019
Legislative Date
2/15/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {623323/1 (Senator Cassilly)
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2019
Legislative Date
2/15/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until 2/18 (Senator Pinsky) Adopted
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2019
Legislative Date
2/18/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {623323/1 (Senator Cassilly) Withdrawn
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2019
Legislative Date
2/18/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {153225/1 (Senator Cassilly) Adopted
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2019
Legislative Date
2/18/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Election Law - Coordinated Expenditures and Donations - Investigation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2019
Legislative Date
2/20/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (43-3)
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2019
Legislative Date
2/21/2019
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
4/05/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until 04/06 (Delegate Walker) Adopted
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (112-27)
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2019
Legislative Date
5/25/2019
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 712
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/17/2019 1/17/2019 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Election Law - Coordinated Expenditures and Donations - Investigation
Senate 1/23/2019 1/23/2019 Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/13/2019 2/13/2019 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/13/2019 2/13/2019 Favorable 25 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/13/2019 2/13/2019 Motion Special Order until 2/14 (Senator Cassilly) Adopted 25 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/14/2019 2/14/2019 Favorable Adopted 26 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/14/2019 2/14/2019 Floor Amendment {623323/1 (Senator Cassilly) 26 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/14/2019 2/14/2019 Motion Laid Over (Senator Ferguson) Adopted 26 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/15/2019 2/15/2019 Floor Amendment {623323/1 (Senator Cassilly) 27 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/15/2019 2/15/2019 Motion Special Order until 2/18 (Senator Pinsky) Adopted 27 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/18/2019 2/18/2019 Floor Amendment {623323/1 (Senator Cassilly) Withdrawn 28 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/18/2019 2/18/2019 Floor Amendment {153225/1 (Senator Cassilly) Adopted 28 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/18/2019 2/18/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 28 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Election Law - Coordinated Expenditures and Donations - Investigation
Senate 2/20/2019 2/20/2019 Third Reading Passed (43-3) 30 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/21/2019 2/21/2019 Referred Ways and Means 32 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2019 4/05/2019 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 4/05/2019 3/29/2019 Favorable Adopted 64 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2019 3/29/2019 Motion Special Order until 04/06 (Delegate Walker) Adopted 64 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2019 3/30/2019 Second Reading Passed 65 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Third Reading Passed (112-27) 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Returned Passed 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/25/2019 5/25/2019 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 712
Text - Chapter - Election Law - Coordinated Expenditures and Donations - Investigation
(   13-249 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM
Click to return on the top page