Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Health Benefit Exchange – Assessment Applicability and State–Based Individual Market Health Insurance Subsidies
Sponsored by
Senators Feldman, Augustine, Beidle, Benson, Hayes, Hershey, Jennings, Kelley, Klausmeier, Kramer, and Reilly
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 104
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Clarifying the applicability of a certain assessment by the State to certain entities for certain products that were subject to § 9010 of the Affordable Care Act, as in effect on December 1,2019; and requiring the Maryland Health Benefit Exchange to report to certain committees of the General Assembly by December 1, 2020, on certain information related to establishing State-based individual market health insurance subsidies in Maryland.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0196
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/09/2020
Legislative Date
1/09/2020
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2020
Legislative Date
1/13/2020
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2020
Legislative Date
3/02/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/29/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {547179/1
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/29/2020
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Ready) Adopted
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2020
Legislative Date
3/01/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {547179/1 Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2020
Legislative Date
3/01/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2020
Legislative Date
3/03/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (43-2)
Proceedings
42
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2020
Legislative Date
3/05/2020
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
42A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {906389/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Cullison) Adopted (133-1)
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (99-33)
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (40-6)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 104
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/09/2020 1/09/2020 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Maryland Health Benefit Exchange - Establishment of a State-Based Health Insurance Subsidies Program
Senate 1/13/2020 1/13/2020 Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/02/2020 3/02/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/03/2020 2/29/2020 Favorable with Amendments {547179/1 39
Senate 3/03/2020 2/29/2020 Motion Laid Over (Senator Ready) Adopted 39
Senate 3/04/2020 3/01/2020 Favorable with Amendments {547179/1 Adopted 40
Senate 3/04/2020 3/01/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 40
Text - Third - Maryland Health Benefit Exchange – Assessment Applicability and State–Based Health Insurance Subsidies Program
Senate 3/06/2020 3/03/2020 Third Reading Passed (43-2) 42
House 3/06/2020 3/05/2020 Referred Health and Government Operations 42A
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/15/2020 3/11/2020 Favorable with Amendments {906389/1 Adopted 48A
House 3/15/2020 3/11/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48A
House 3/15/2020 3/11/2020 Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Cullison) Adopted (133-1) 48A
House 3/15/2020 3/11/2020 Third Reading Passed (99-33) 48A
Senate 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Senate Concurs House Amendments 51
Senate 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Third Reading Passed (40-6) 51
Senate 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Maryland Health Benefit Exchange – Assessment Applicability and State–Based Individual Market Health Insurance Subsidies
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 104
Text - Chapter - Maryland Health Benefit Exchange – Assessment Applicability and State–Based Individual Market Health Insurance Subsidies
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 7/1/2020 2:23 PM