Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Woodrow Wilson Bridge and Tunnel Compact - Repeal
Sponsored by
Senator Feldman
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 682
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing provisions relating to the Woodrow Wilson Bridge and Tunnel Compact; repealing a requirement that the Governor execute the compact with the Commonwealth of Virginia and the District of Columbia under specified circumstances; repealing the Woodrow Wilson Memorial Bridge and Tunnel Authority; repealing a requirement that the compact may not be interpreted to affect the levy of specified taxes; repealing the specified powers of the Authority to operate a project to upgrade the Interstate 95 Potomac River crossing; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0082
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/16/2017
Legislative Date
1/16/2017
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Woodrow Wilson Bridge and Tunnel Compact - Repeal
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2017
Legislative Date
1/17/2017
Action
Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2017
Legislative Date
1/17/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2017
Legislative Date
1/17/2017
Action
Hearing 2/01 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2017
Legislative Date
2/06/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2017
Legislative Date
2/07/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
18
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2017
Legislative Date
2/07/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
18
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Woodrow Wilson Bridge and Tunnel Compact - Repeal
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2017
Legislative Date
2/09/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
20
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
23
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/06/2017
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (141-0)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2017
Legislative Date
5/25/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 682
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Woodrow Wilson Bridge and Tunnel Compact - Repeal
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/16/2017 1/16/2017 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Woodrow Wilson Bridge and Tunnel Compact - Repeal
Senate 1/17/2017 1/17/2017 Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/17/2017 1/17/2017 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/17/2017 1/17/2017 Hearing 2/01 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 2/06/2017 2/06/2017 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 2/07/2017 2/07/2017 Favorable Adopted 18
Senate 2/07/2017 2/07/2017 Second Reading Passed 18
Text - Third - Woodrow Wilson Bridge and Tunnel Compact - Repeal
Senate 2/09/2017 2/09/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 20
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 Referred Environment and Transportation 23
House 3/06/2017 3/06/2017 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 4/03/2017 4/03/2017 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/03/2017 3/27/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 61A
House 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Third Reading Passed (141-0) 67
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Returned Passed 63A
Post Passage 5/25/2017 5/25/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 682
Text - Chapter - Woodrow Wilson Bridge and Tunnel Compact - Repeal
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-301, 10-302, 10-303 )
(   1995, 1996 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM