Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Private Passenger Motor Vehicle Insurance - Prohibition on Cancellation Due to Towing or Emergency Roadside Coverage Claims
Sponsored by
Senator Feldman
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 63
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting an insurer from canceling, refusing to renew, or otherwise terminating coverage for a private passenger motor vehicle insurance policy based on claims made under the policy's towing or emergency roadside coverage; authorizing an insurer to remove towing or emergency roadside service coverage from a certain policy at renewal based on the number of claims pursuant to the towing coverage; and authorizing an insurer to increase a premium of a private passenger motor vehicle insurance policy as a result of certain claims.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Economic Matters
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0118
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/09/2020
Legislative Date
1/09/2020
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2020
Legislative Date
1/13/2020
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2020
Legislative Date
2/11/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
25
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2020
Legislative Date
2/11/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
25
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2020
Legislative Date
2/13/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
27
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2020
Legislative Date
2/14/2020
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
28
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/17/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
51A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-0)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53C
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 63
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/09/2020 1/09/2020 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Private Passenger Motor Vehicle Insurance - Prohibition on Cancellation Due to Towing or Emergency Roadside Coverage Claims
Senate 1/13/2020 1/13/2020 Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 2/11/2020 2/11/2020 Favorable Adopted 25
Senate 2/11/2020 2/11/2020 Second Reading Passed 25
Text - Third - Private Passenger Motor Vehicle Insurance - Prohibition on Cancellation Due to Towing or Emergency Roadside Coverage Claims
Senate 2/13/2020 2/13/2020 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 27
House 2/14/2020 2/14/2020 Referred Economic Matters 28
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/17/2020 3/17/2020 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/17/2020 3/14/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 51A
House 3/18/2020 3/16/2020 Third Reading Passed (131-0) 53
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Returned Passed 53C
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 63
Text - Chapter - Private Passenger Motor Vehicle Insurance - Prohibition on Cancellation Due to Towing or Emergency Roadside Coverage Claims
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 7/1/2020 2:36 PM