Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2013
Sponsored by
The President (By Request - Administration)
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the frequency with which specified payments from a special fund are required to be paid; requiring the reduction of specified grants and payments under specified circumstances; altering or repealing specified required appropriations; altering the distribution of specified revenue; providing for the transfer of specified funds for specified purposes; repealing specified requirements for a notice relating to abandoned property to be published in specified newspapers; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0102
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2013, July 1, 2013
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2013
Legislative Date
1/16/2013
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/15/2013 1/16/2013 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-404, 11-404.1 )
(   17-311 )
(   22-306.1 )
(   10-704.1, 2-202, 2-606, 8-406 )
(   13-209 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM