Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Health - Required Temperatures for Sale of Crab Meat - Repeal
Sponsored by
Senator Simonaire
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 53
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing a specified provision of law that prohibits a person from keeping for sale any unfrozen crab meat, any frozen crab meat, or any pasteurized crab meat at temperatures that exceed specified maximum temperatures.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0524
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/16/2017
Legislative Date
1/16/2017
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/16/2017
Legislative Date
1/16/2017
Action
Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Health - Required Temperatures for Sale of Crab Meat - Repeal
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2017
Legislative Date
2/06/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2017
Legislative Date
2/07/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
18
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2017
Legislative Date
2/07/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
18
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Public Health - Required Temperatures for Sale of Crab Meat - Repeal
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2017
Legislative Date
2/09/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
20
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
23
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/24/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/21/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
55
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2017
Legislative Date
3/25/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/11/2017
Legislative Date
4/11/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 53
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Public Health - Required Temperatures for Sale of Crab Meat - Repeal
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/16/2017 1/16/2017 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/16/2017 1/16/2017 Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Public Health - Required Temperatures for Sale of Crab Meat - Repeal
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 2/06/2017 2/06/2017 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 2/07/2017 2/07/2017 Favorable Adopted 18
Senate 2/07/2017 2/07/2017 Second Reading Passed 18
Text - Third - Public Health - Required Temperatures for Sale of Crab Meat - Repeal
Senate 2/09/2017 2/09/2017 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 20
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 Referred Health and Government Operations 23
House 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/24/2017 3/24/2017 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/24/2017 3/21/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 55
House 3/28/2017 3/23/2017 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 57
Senate 3/29/2017 3/25/2017 Returned Passed 54
Post Passage 4/11/2017 4/11/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 53
Text - Chapter - Public Health - Required Temperatures for Sale of Crab Meat - Repeal
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM