Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law – Possession With Intent to Distribute Marijuana – Presumption
Sponsored by
Senator Zirkin
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing a presumption that a quantity of marijuana that is equal to or less than the quantity for which a person must be charged by citation under certain provisions of law is not a sufficient quantity to reasonably indicate under all circumstances an intent to distribute or dispense marijuana; and authorizing the State to rebut a certain presumption by showing evidence of an intent to sell marijuana.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/11/2018
Legislative Date
1/11/2018
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2018
Legislative Date
1/15/2018
Action
Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2018
Legislative Date
1/22/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2018
Legislative Date
1/22/2018
Action
Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/05/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {338574/1 Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2018
Legislative Date
3/08/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-1)
Proceedings
42
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2018
Legislative Date
3/09/2018
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/11/2018 1/11/2018 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Criminal Law - Possession With Intent to Distribute Marijuana - Rebuttable Presumption
Senate 1/15/2018 1/15/2018 Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/22/2018 1/22/2018 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/22/2018 1/22/2018 Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/05/2018 3/05/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Favorable with Amendments {338574/1 Adopted 40
Senate 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 40
Text - Third - Criminal Law – Possession With Intent to Distribute Marijuana – Presumption
Senate 3/08/2018 3/08/2018 Third Reading Passed (45-1) 42
House 3/09/2018 3/09/2018 Referred Judiciary 43
House 3/13/2018 3/13/2018 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-602 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM