Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Local Government – Animal Control Facilities – Adoption Fee Waiver for Veterans (Pets for Vets Act of 2020)
Sponsored by
Senators Simonaire, Bailey, Beidle, Edwards, Gallion, Hershey, Peters, Reilly, Salling, Young, Carozza, Ellis, and Lam
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring an animal control facility operated by a county or municipality to waive the adoption fee for a dog or cat for a veteran who presents a valid driver's license or identification card that includes a notation of veteran status; authorizing an animal control facility to limit the number of adoption fee waivers granted to an individual under the Act to one dog and one cat within a 6-month period; and applying the Act to all counties and municipalities.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/09/2020
Legislative Date
1/09/2020
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2020
Legislative Date
1/15/2020
Action
Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2020
Legislative Date
2/11/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {724836/1 Adopted
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2020
Legislative Date
2/11/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2020
Legislative Date
2/13/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2020
Legislative Date
2/14/2020
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/09/2020 1/09/2020 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Local Government – Animal Control Facilities – Adoption Fee Waiver for Veterans (Pets for Vets Act of 2020)
Senate 1/15/2020 1/15/2020 Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/11/2020 2/11/2020 Favorable with Amendments {724836/1 Adopted 25 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/11/2020 2/11/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 25 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Local Government – Animal Control Facilities – Adoption Fee Waiver for Veterans (Pets for Vets Act of 2020)
Senate 2/13/2020 2/13/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 27 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/14/2020 2/14/2020 Referred Environment and Transportation 28 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/11/2020 3/11/2020 Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/16/2020 3/16/2020 Hearing canceled
House 3/16/2020 3/16/2020 Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:51 PM
Click to return on the top page