Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education – Harford County – Liability of School Bus Contractors
Sponsored by
Senator Gallion
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/20 at 3:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing that an entity operating a school bus under a contract with the Harford County Board of Education to provide student transportation services may not be held liable beyond the limits of the entity's insurance coverage under the contract with the Harford County Board of Education through the Maryland Association of Boards of Education in any suit that arises from a vehicular accident or an act or omission of an officer, a director, or an employee of the entity except under certain circumstances.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0054
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0755 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/07/2020
Legislative Date
10/07/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/29/2020
Legislative Date
12/29/2020
Action
Hearing 1/20 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Education – Harford County – Liability of School Bus Contractors
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/06/2021
Legislative Date
1/06/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/06/2021
Legislative Date
1/06/2021
Action
Hearing 1/20 at 3:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 10/07/2020 10/07/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 12/29/2020 12/29/2020 Hearing 1/20 at 2:00 p.m.
Text - First - Education – Harford County – Liability of School Bus Contractors
Senate 1/06/2021 1/06/2021 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/06/2021 1/06/2021 Hearing 1/20 at 3:00 p.m.
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/21/2021 4:10 PM
Click to return on the top page