Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Charge by Citation - Violation of Condition of Release
Sponsored by
Senator Lee
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 46
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the designation of a certain crime that a police officer may not charge by citation.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0121
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/18/2019
Legislative Date
1/18/2019
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2019
Legislative Date
1/23/2019
Action
Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2019
Legislative Date
2/15/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2019
Legislative Date
2/20/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
30
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2019
Legislative Date
2/20/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
30
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2019
Legislative Date
2/22/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
32
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2019
Legislative Date
2/25/2019
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
34
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/23/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2019
Legislative Date
4/18/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 46
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/18/2019 1/18/2019 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Charge by Citation - Violation of Condition of Release
Senate 1/23/2019 1/23/2019 Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/15/2019 2/15/2019 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/20/2019 2/20/2019 Favorable Adopted 30
Senate 2/20/2019 2/20/2019 Second Reading Passed 30
Text - Third - Criminal Procedure - Charge by Citation - Violation of Condition of Release
Senate 2/22/2019 2/22/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 32
House 2/25/2019 2/25/2019 Referred Judiciary 34
House 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/29/2019 3/29/2019 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 3/29/2019 3/21/2019 Favorable Adopted 56
House 3/29/2019 3/21/2019 Second Reading Passed 56
House 4/02/2019 3/23/2019 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 58
Senate 4/03/2019 3/28/2019 Returned Passed 60
Post Passage 4/18/2019 4/18/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 46
Text - Chapter - Criminal Procedure - Charge by Citation - Violation of Condition of Release
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM