Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Labor and Employment - Apprenticeship and Training Council - Representation
Sponsored by
Senator Patterson
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring the Apprenticeship and Training Council to include representation by individuals who are Black and Latino.
Committees
Original:
Finance
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/29/2020
Legislative Date
10/29/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/11/2021
Legislative Date
1/11/2021
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Finance
Senate 10/29/2020 10/29/2020 Pre-filed
Text - First - Labor and Employment - Apprenticeship and Training Council - Representation
Senate 1/11/2021 1/11/2021 Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/18/2021 11:59 AM