Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City Community College - Tuition Waivers - Graduates of Baltimore City Public High Schools
Sponsored by
Senator Gladden
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring an exemption from the payment of tuition at the Baltimore City Community College for any student eligible for in-State tuition who is a graduate of a Baltimore City public high school; and requiring that a specified individual be counted in computing full-time equivalent enrollment at the Baltimore City Community College if the individual is enrolled in a class that is eligible for State support.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2015
Legislative Date
1/28/2015
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2015
Legislative Date
1/28/2015
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2015
Legislative Date
1/29/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2015
Legislative Date
1/29/2015
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/27/2015 1/28/2015 First Reading Budget and Taxation and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/28/2015 1/28/2015 Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Senate 1/29/2015 1/29/2015 Hearing cancelled
Senate 1/29/2015 1/29/2015 Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   16-106, 16-514 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM