Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Anne Arundel County - Board of Education - Selection of Members
Sponsored by
Senators Simonaire and Astle
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing a procedure for the election and appointment of members of the Anne Arundel County Board of Education; requiring specified members of the county board to be elected from councilmanic districts; providing a maximum of two consecutive 4-year terms for specified members of the board; requiring the School Board Appointment Commission to appoint specified members of the board and ensure that the total board makeup reflects a specified diversity; providing residency requirements; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0160
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/16/2017
Legislative Date
1/16/2017
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/16/2017
Legislative Date
1/16/2017
Action
Hearing 1/25 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Anne Arundel County - Board of Education - Selection of Members
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/18/2017
Legislative Date
1/18/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/18/2017
Legislative Date
1/18/2017
Action
Hearing 1/25 at 3:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {524833/1 Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Anne Arundel County - Board of Education - Selection of Members
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-1)
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2017
Legislative Date
3/22/2017
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/16/2017 1/16/2017 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/16/2017 1/16/2017 Hearing 1/25 at 2:00 p.m.
Text - First - Anne Arundel County - Board of Education - Selection of Members
Senate 1/18/2017 1/18/2017 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/18/2017 1/18/2017 Hearing 1/25 at 3:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/16/2017 3/16/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/16/2017 3/16/2017 Favorable with Amendments {524833/1 Adopted 45
Senate 3/16/2017 3/16/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45
Text - Third - Anne Arundel County - Board of Education - Selection of Members
Senate 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Third Reading Passed (45-1) 46
House 3/17/2017 3/14/2017 Referred Ways and Means 48
House 3/22/2017 3/22/2017 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-108, 3-110, 3-114, 3-2A-01 through 3-2A-10, 3-2A-02, 3-2A-07, 3-2B-01 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM