Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
State Highways - Commercial Signs in Rights-of-Way - Penalties
Sponsored by
Senator Simonaire
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Analysis
Synopsis
Increasing the maximum civil penalty applicable to a violation for affixing a commercial sign to a State highway sign, signal, or marker in the State highway right-of-way to $100 per commercial sign affixed; and clarifying certain language establishing a civil penalty for a violation of the prohibition against placing or maintaining commercial signs in a State highway right-of-way.
Committees
Original:
Finance
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/09/2020
Legislative Date
1/09/2020
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/09/2020
Legislative Date
1/09/2020
Action
Hearing 1/21 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - State Highways - Commercial Signs in Rights-of-Way - Penalties
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2020
Legislative Date
1/10/2020
Action
Reassigned to Finance
Proceedings
3
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2020
Legislative Date
1/10/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2020
Legislative Date
1/13/2020
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/09/2020 1/09/2020 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/09/2020 1/09/2020 Hearing 1/21 at 2:00 p.m.
Text - First - State Highways - Commercial Signs in Rights-of-Way - Penalties
Senate 1/10/2020 1/10/2020 Reassigned to Finance 3
Senate 1/10/2020 1/10/2020 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/13/2020 1/13/2020 Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/19/2020 9:41 AM