Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Cecil-Harford Highway Impact Revenue Account
Sponsored by
Senators Glassman, Jacobs, and Jennings
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Creating a Cecil-Harford Highway Impact Revenue Account in the Transportation Authority Fund; specifying the purpose of the Account; establishing the composition of the Account; providing for the use of funds in the Account; and providing for the transfer of funds in the Transportation Authority Fund to the Account under specified circumstances.
Committees
Opposite:
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0260 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2013
Legislative Date
1/16/2013
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation and Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/16/2013
Legislative Date
1/16/2013
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2013
Legislative Date
2/20/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/15/2013 1/16/2013 First Reading Budget and Taxation and Finance
Senate 1/16/2013 1/16/2013 Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Senate 2/19/2013 2/20/2013 Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM