Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Farm Area Motor Vehicles - Registration and Authorized Use
Sponsored by
Senators Gallion, Bailey, Carozza, Cassilly, Eckardt, Edwards, Ellis, Hershey, Hester, Hough, Jennings, Miller, Peters, Ready, Reilly, Salling, Simonaire, West, and Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 173
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing the termination date for certain provisions of law applicable to the registration and authorized use of farm area motor vehicles, including a provision increasing from 10 miles to 25 miles the radius from a farm within which a person may operate on a highway a motor vehicle registered as a farm area motor vehicle; and requiring the owner of a farm area motor vehicle to submit a certain application and documentation for registration of the vehicle.
Committees
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: HB0331
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/18/2019
Legislative Date
1/18/2019
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Farm Area Motor Vehicles - Registration and Authorized Use
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2019
Legislative Date
1/22/2019
Action
Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
19A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
19A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Farm Area Motor Vehicles - Registration and Authorized Use
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2019
Legislative Date
2/07/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
21
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
23
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/19/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/22/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2019
Legislative Date
4/18/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 173
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Farm Area Motor Vehicles - Registration and Authorized Use
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/18/2019 1/18/2019 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Farm Area Motor Vehicles - Registration and Authorized Use
Senate 1/22/2019 1/22/2019 Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2019 2/04/2019 Favorable Adopted 19A
Senate 2/05/2019 2/04/2019 Second Reading Passed 19A
Text - Third - Farm Area Motor Vehicles - Registration and Authorized Use
Senate 2/07/2019 2/07/2019 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 21
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 Referred Environment and Transportation 23
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/27/2019 3/27/2019 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/27/2019 3/19/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 54
House 4/01/2019 3/22/2019 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 57
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Returned Passed 59
Post Passage 4/18/2019 4/18/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 173
Text - Chapter - Farm Area Motor Vehicles - Registration and Authorized Use
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-935 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM