Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Local Tax Relief for Working Families Act of 2021
Sponsored by
Senator Rosapepe
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing to 2.25% the minimum rate a county shall impose on an individual's Maryland taxable income; increasing to 3.5% the maximum rate a county may impose on an individual's Maryland taxable income for a taxable year beginning after December 31, 2021; requiring a county, with regard to any increase to its county income tax rate that is effective on or after January 1, 2022, to impose the increase on an income bracket basis; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0319
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1494 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/05/2020
Legislative Date
10/05/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/22/2020
Legislative Date
12/22/2020
Action
Hearing 1/20 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Local Tax Relief for Working Families Act of 2021
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2021
Legislative Date
1/12/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2021
Legislative Date
1/12/2021
Action
Hearing 1/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/18/2021
Legislative Date
1/18/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/18/2021
Legislative Date
1/18/2021
Action
Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 10/05/2020 10/05/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 12/22/2020 12/22/2020 Hearing 1/20 at 11:00 a.m.
Text - First - Local Tax Relief for Working Families Act of 2021
Senate 1/12/2021 1/12/2021 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/12/2021 1/12/2021 Hearing 1/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/18/2021 1/18/2021 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/18/2021 1/18/2021 Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 1/20/2021 9:29 AM
Click to return on the top page