Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Health Insurance Plan - Access for Bridge Eligible Individuals
Sponsored by
The President (By Request - Administration) and Senators Middleton, Astle, Feldman, Kelley, Klausmeier, Mathias, and Pugh
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 1
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the purpose of the Maryland Health Insurance Plan to include decreasing uncompensated care costs by providing access to affordable, comprehensive health benefits for specified bridge eligible individuals; providing that it is the intent of the General Assembly that Maryland Health Insurance Plan Fund revenue be used to subsidize health insurance coverage for specified bridge eligible individuals; etc.
Committees
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: HB0119
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2014
Legislative Date
1/09/2014
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/09/2014
Legislative Date
1/09/2014
Action
Hearing 1/14 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/14/2014
Legislative Date
1/15/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/16/2014
Legislative Date
1/16/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {377179/1
Proceedings
7
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/16/2014
Legislative Date
1/16/2014
Action
Laid Over (Senator Middleton) Adopted
Proceedings
7
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2014
Legislative Date
1/17/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {377179/1
Proceedings
8
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2014
Legislative Date
1/17/2014
Action
Special Order until 1/20 (Senator Brinkley) Adopted
Proceedings
8
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2014
Legislative Date
1/17/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {377179/1 Report Adopted (36-8)
Proceedings
8A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2014
Legislative Date
1/17/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
8A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2014
Legislative Date
1/21/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (38-8)
Proceedings
9
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2014
Legislative Date
1/22/2014
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
11
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2014
Legislative Date
1/23/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2014
Legislative Date
1/23/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {966487/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
12
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2014
Legislative Date
1/23/2014
Action
Special Order until 1/24 (Delegate Hammen) Adopted
Proceedings
12
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2014
Legislative Date
1/24/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
13
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2014
Legislative Date
1/28/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (94-42)
Proceedings
15
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2014
Legislative Date
1/29/2014
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
15
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2014
Legislative Date
1/29/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (34-7)
Proceedings
15
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2014
Legislative Date
1/29/2014
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
15
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
1/30/2014
Legislative Date
1/30/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 1
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/08/2014 1/09/2014 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/09/2014 1/09/2014 Hearing 1/14 at 2:00 p.m.
Senate 1/14/2014 1/15/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 1/16/2014 1/16/2014 Favorable with Amendments {377179/1 7
Senate 1/16/2014 1/16/2014 Laid Over (Senator Middleton) Adopted 7
Senate 1/17/2014 1/17/2014 Favorable with Amendments {377179/1 8
Senate 1/17/2014 1/17/2014 Special Order until 1/20 (Senator Brinkley) Adopted 8
Senate 1/20/2014 1/17/2014 Favorable with Amendments {377179/1 Report Adopted (36-8) 8A
Senate 1/20/2014 1/17/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 8A
Senate 1/21/2014 1/21/2014 Third Reading Passed (38-8) 9
House 1/22/2014 1/22/2014 First Reading Health and Government Operations 11
House 1/22/2014 1/23/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 1/23/2014 1/23/2014 Favorable with Amendments {966487/1 Report Adopted 12
House 1/23/2014 1/23/2014 Special Order until 1/24 (Delegate Hammen) Adopted 12
House 1/24/2014 1/24/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 13
House 1/28/2014 1/28/2014 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (94-42) 15
Senate 1/29/2014 1/29/2014 Senate Concur - House Amendments 15
Senate 1/29/2014 1/29/2014 Third Reading Passed (34-7) 15
Senate 1/29/2014 1/29/2014 Passed Enrolled 15
Post Passage 1/30/2014 1/30/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 1
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-501, 14-502, 14-503 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM