Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Rates
Sponsored by
Senators Serafini, Bates, Cassilly, Eckardt, Edwards, Hershey, Jennings, Norman, Ready, Salling, and Waugh
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the State income tax rate on the Maryland taxable income of specified individuals and specified spouses filing a joint return, surviving spouses, or heads of household; and applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2017.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/16/2017
Legislative Date
1/16/2017
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Income Tax - Rates
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/18/2017
Legislative Date
1/18/2017
Action
Hearing 2/01 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2017
Legislative Date
1/31/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2017
Legislative Date
2/06/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/16/2017 1/16/2017 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Income Tax - Rates
Senate 1/18/2017 1/18/2017 Hearing 2/01 at 2:00 p.m.
Senate 1/31/2017 1/31/2017 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/06/2017 2/06/2017 Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-105 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM