Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Watershed Protection and Restoration Program - Enforcement by Department of the Environment - Moratorium
Sponsored by
Senator Glassman
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting the Department of the Environment from taking an administrative action to enforce specified watershed protection and restoration program requirements or imposing a penalty for a violation of specified provisions of law or regulations before July 1, 2015.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2014
Legislative Date
1/09/2014
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2014
Legislative Date
1/10/2014
Action
Hearing 1/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2014
Legislative Date
2/10/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/08/2014 1/09/2014 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/10/2014 1/10/2014 Hearing 1/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/07/2014 2/10/2014 Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-202.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM