Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Crimes - Child Abuse and Neglect - Failure to Report
Sponsored by
Senators Lee, Brochin, Cassilly, Hough, Kelley, Muse, Norman, Ramirez, Ready, Smith, and Zirkin
Status
In the House - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing that specified persons who are required to provide specified notice or make reports of suspected child abuse or neglect may not knowingly fail to give the notice or make the reports if the specified person has actual knowledge of the abuse or neglect or witnesses the act of the abuse or neglect; establishing a misdemeanor and penalties on conviction of a fine not to exceed $1,000 or maximum imprisonment of 6 months or both for knowingly failing to report child abuse or neglect; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0140 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/16/2017
Legislative Date
1/16/2017
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Crimes - Child Abuse and Neglect - Failure to Report
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2017
Legislative Date
1/20/2017
Action
Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/24/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/22/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {278376/1 Adopted
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/22/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Crimes - Child Abuse and Neglect - Failure to Report
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/22/2017
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Rereferred to Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/16/2017 1/16/2017 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Crimes - Child Abuse and Neglect - Failure to Report
Senate 1/20/2017 1/20/2017 Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/24/2017 3/24/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/24/2017 3/22/2017 Favorable with Amendments {278376/1 Adopted 51
Senate 3/24/2017 3/22/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 51
Text - Third - Crimes - Child Abuse and Neglect - Failure to Report
Senate 3/27/2017 3/23/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 52
House 3/27/2017 3/22/2017 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 56
House 4/04/2017 4/05/2017 Rereferred to Judiciary
House 4/04/2017 4/04/2017 Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-602.2 )
(   5-704 )
Last Updated: 1/23/2020 7:43 PM