Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Health - Overdose and Infectious Disease Prevention Site Program
Sponsored by
Senators Feldman, Benson, Carter, Ferguson, Hayes, King, Kramer, Lee, Washington, and Young
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the establishment of an Overdose and Infectious Disease Prevention Site Program by a community-based organization to provide a place for the consumption of preobtained drugs, provide sterile needles, administer first aid, and provide certain other services; providing the Maryland Department of Health may approve not more than six programs each to operate in a single location in an area of high incidence drug use; requiring each program to submit a certain report to certain legislative committees by December 1 each year; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0139
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2019
Legislative Date
1/21/2019
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2019
Legislative Date
1/25/2019
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2019
Legislative Date
2/01/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2019
Legislative Date
2/01/2019
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2019
Legislative Date
2/01/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2019
Legislative Date
2/01/2019
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/21/2019 1/21/2019 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Public Health - Overdose and Infectious Disease Prevention Site Program
Senate 1/25/2019 1/25/2019 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/01/2019 2/01/2019 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/01/2019 2/01/2019 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/01/2019 2/01/2019 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/01/2019 2/01/2019 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/27/2019 3/27/2019 Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   24-1601 through 24-1606 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM