Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Parking Violations - Authority of Political Subdivisions
Sponsored by
Senators Lee and Smith
Status
In the Senate - Recommitted to Judicial Proceedings (Senator Lee)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a political subdivision from adopting or enforcing a regulation or an ordinance that imposes specified additional penalties for a parking violation within 30 days after the issuance of the citation.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/16/2017
Legislative Date
1/16/2017
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2017
Legislative Date
1/17/2017
Action
Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2017
Legislative Date
2/06/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {628570/1
Proceedings
19
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Ferguson) Adopted
Proceedings
19
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2017
Legislative Date
2/09/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {628570/1 (Judicial Proceedings Committee)
Proceedings
20
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2017
Legislative Date
2/09/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until 2/15 (Senator Lee) Adopted
Proceedings
20
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2017
Legislative Date
2/15/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {628570/1
Proceedings
24
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2017
Legislative Date
2/15/2017
Action
Motion Recommit to Committee (Senator Lee) Adopted
Proceedings
24
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/16/2017 1/16/2017 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - Parking Violations - Authority of Political Subdivisions
Senate 1/17/2017 1/17/2017 Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/06/2017 2/06/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Favorable with Amendments {628570/1 19
Senate 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Motion Laid Over (Senator Ferguson) Adopted 19
Senate 2/09/2017 2/09/2017 Favorable with Amendments {628570/1 (Judicial Proceedings Committee) 20
Senate 2/09/2017 2/09/2017 Motion Special Order until 2/15 (Senator Lee) Adopted 20
Senate 2/15/2017 2/15/2017 Favorable with Amendments {628570/1 24
Senate 2/15/2017 2/15/2017 Motion Recommit to Committee (Senator Lee) Adopted 24
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   26-301 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM