Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Rural Maryland Prosperity Investment Fund - Revisions and Extension of Termination Date
Sponsored by
Senators Conway, Middleton, Dyson, Ferguson, Jennings, Young, Montgomery, and Simonaire
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 469
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Extending to fiscal year 2030 the fiscal year through which the Governor is authorized to include an appropriation in the budget bill for the Rural Maryland Prosperity Investment Fund; altering the manner in which disbursements of money appropriated to the Fund are required to be made; requiring that any money received by a regional council under a specified provision of law be used for a specified purpose; extending the termination date of the Fund to June 30, 2030; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1024
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/09/2014
Legislative Date
1/10/2014
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2014
Legislative Date
1/10/2014
Action
Hearing 1/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2014
Legislative Date
1/23/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2014
Legislative Date
1/24/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {114731/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
12
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2014
Legislative Date
1/24/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
12
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2014
Legislative Date
1/28/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
14
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2014
Legislative Date
1/29/2014
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
16
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/05/2014
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2014
Legislative Date
5/15/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 469
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/09/2014 1/10/2014 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/10/2014 1/10/2014 Hearing 1/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/22/2014 1/23/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/24/2014 1/24/2014 Favorable with Amendments {114731/1 Report Adopted 12
Senate 1/24/2014 1/24/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 12
Senate 1/28/2014 1/28/2014 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 14
House 1/29/2014 1/29/2014 First Reading Environmental Matters 16
House 3/05/2014 3/05/2014 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/28/2014 3/31/2014 Favorable Report by Environmental Matters
House 3/31/2014 3/24/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 60
House 3/31/2014 3/24/2014 Second Reading Passed 60
House 4/01/2014 3/25/2014 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 61
Senate 4/03/2014 3/25/2014 Returned Passed 59
Post Passage 5/15/2014 5/15/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 469
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM