Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Crimes - Solicitation to Commit Crimes - Statute of Limitations
Sponsored by
Senators Cassilly, Bates, Eckardt, Edwards, Hershey, Hough, Jennings, Norman, Reilly, Salling, Simonaire, and Waugh
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that the statute of limitations for the crime of solicitation to commit murder in the first degree, murder in the second degree, assault in the first degree, assault in the second degree, rape in the first degree, rape in the second degree, arson in the first degree, or arson in the second degree is the statute of limitations for the prosecution of the substantive crime that is the subject of the solicitation.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2015
Legislative Date
1/29/2015
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2015
Legislative Date
1/30/2015
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/28/2015 1/29/2015 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/30/2015 1/30/2015 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM