Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax Credit - Security Clearances - Employer Costs - Extension
Sponsored by
Senators Manno and Miller
Status
Veto sustained (0-44)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Extending from January 1, 2017, to January 1, 2022, the termination of an income tax credit that specified individuals or corporations may claim against the State income tax for costs incurred to obtain federal security clearances, to rent specified facilities, and to construct or renovate a sensitive compartmented information facility.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0873
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/16/2017
Legislative Date
1/16/2017
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Income Tax Credit - Security Clearances - Employer Costs - Extension
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/18/2017
Legislative Date
1/18/2017
Action
Hearing 2/01 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2017
Legislative Date
2/06/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
19
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Income Tax Credit - Security Clearances - Employer Costs - Extension
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2017
Legislative Date
2/13/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
22
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2017
Legislative Date
2/14/2017
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
25
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2017
Legislative Date
3/01/2017
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
4/06/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (120-14)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/26/2017
Legislative Date
5/26/2017
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Governor's Veto Letter
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2018
Legislative Date
1/12/2018
Action
Veto sustained (0-44)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/16/2017 1/16/2017 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Income Tax Credit - Security Clearances - Employer Costs - Extension
Senate 1/18/2017 1/18/2017 Hearing 2/01 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/06/2017 2/06/2017 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 19
Text - Third - Income Tax Credit - Security Clearances - Employer Costs - Extension
Senate 2/13/2017 2/13/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 22
House 2/14/2017 2/14/2017 Referred Ways and Means 25
House 3/01/2017 3/01/2017 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 4/06/2017 4/06/2017 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 4/06/2017 3/30/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 64
House 4/07/2017 3/31/2017 Third Reading Passed (120-14) 65
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Returned Passed 62
Post Passage 5/26/2017 5/26/2017 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Governor's Veto Letter
Senate 1/12/2018 1/12/2018 Veto sustained (0-44)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-732 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM