Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Baltimore County Public Library - Collective Bargaining
Sponsored by
Senator Hettleman
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing employees of the Baltimore County Public Library to form, join, and participate in an employee organization and engage in certain other activities related to collective bargaining; specifying the responsibilities of the library and the certified exclusive representative; requiring the library to recognize certain rights of the certified exclusive representative; requiring the certified exclusive representative to represent employees in a certain manner; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0045
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/29/2020
Legislative Date
10/29/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Education - Baltimore County Public Library - Collective Bargaining
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/11/2021
Legislative Date
1/11/2021
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Finance
Senate 10/29/2020 10/29/2020 Pre-filed
Text - First - Education - Baltimore County Public Library - Collective Bargaining
Senate 1/11/2021 1/11/2021 Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
(   23-701 through 23-709 )
Last Updated: 1/26/2021 2:55 PM
Click to return on the top page