Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Threat of Mass Violence
Sponsored by
Senators Lee, Augustine, Elfreth, Ellis, Feldman, Griffith, Hayes, Hough, Kelley, King, Lam, Nathan-Pulliam, Patterson, Pinsky, Rosapepe, Smith, Waldstreicher, Zirkin, Carozza, and Simonaire
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 31
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering a certain prohibition relating to threatening to commit a certain crime of violence in order to prohibit a person from knowingly threatening to commit or threatening to cause to be committed a certain crime of violence that would place five or more people at substantial risk of death or serious physical injury if the threat were carried out; providing that a person who violates the Act is guilty of a misdemeanor and on conviction is subject to imprisonment of up to 10 years and a fine not to exceed $10,000 or both; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: HB0420
Introduced in a prior session as: SB1250 Session: 2018 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2019
Legislative Date
1/21/2019
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Criminal Law - Threat of Mass Violence
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2019
Legislative Date
1/25/2019
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2019
Legislative Date
2/15/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2019
Legislative Date
2/20/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
30
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2019
Legislative Date
2/20/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {203920/1 (Senator Carozza) Adopted
Proceedings
30
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2019
Legislative Date
2/20/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {783828/1 (Senator Simonaire) Adopted
Proceedings
30
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2019
Legislative Date
2/20/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
30
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Criminal Law - Threat of Mass Violence
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2019
Legislative Date
2/22/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
32
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2019
Legislative Date
2/25/2019
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
34
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/23/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2019
Legislative Date
4/18/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 31
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Criminal Law - Threat of Mass Violence
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/21/2019 1/21/2019 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Criminal Law - Threat of Mass Violence
Senate 1/25/2019 1/25/2019 Hearing 2/07 at 12:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/15/2019 2/15/2019 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/20/2019 2/20/2019 Favorable Adopted 30
Senate 2/20/2019 2/20/2019 Floor Amendment {203920/1 (Senator Carozza) Adopted 30
Senate 2/20/2019 2/20/2019 Floor Amendment {783828/1 (Senator Simonaire) Adopted 30
Senate 2/20/2019 2/20/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 30
Text - Third - Criminal Law - Threat of Mass Violence
Senate 2/22/2019 2/22/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 32
House 2/25/2019 2/25/2019 Referred Judiciary 34
House 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 4/02/2019 4/02/2019 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 4/02/2019 3/23/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 58
House 4/04/2019 3/26/2019 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 61
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Returned Passed 62
Post Passage 4/18/2019 4/18/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 31
Text - Chapter - Criminal Law - Threat of Mass Violence
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-1001 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM