Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Interstate Occupational Therapy Licensure Compact
Sponsored by
Senators Carozza and Beidle
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Entering into the Interstate Occupational Therapy Licensure Compact; stating the purpose of the Compact; requiring a state to meet certain requirements to participate in the Compact; establishing certain duties of member states; authorizing a certain state to charge a certain fee for granting a certain compact privilege; requiring certain occupational therapists or occupational therapy assistants to meet certain eligibility requirements to receive certain licensure and exercise a certain privilege; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0540
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Contingency - on adoption of an interstate compact
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/28/2020
Legislative Date
10/28/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Interstate Occupational Therapy Licensure Compact
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/06/2021
Legislative Date
1/06/2021
Action
Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 10/28/2020 10/28/2020 Pre-filed
Text - First - Interstate Occupational Therapy Licensure Compact
Senate 1/06/2021 1/06/2021 Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 1/27/2021 2:21 PM
Click to return on the top page