Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Kent County - Tobacco Products Offenses - Citations Issued by Alcoholic Beverages Inspectors
Sponsored by
Senator Hershey
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing an alcoholic beverages inspector for Kent County to issue a citation if the inspector has probable cause to believe that specified offenses involving the distribution of tobacco products or paraphernalia or the possession of tobacco products are being committed or have been committed.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0865
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2015
Legislative Date
1/29/2015
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2015
Legislative Date
1/30/2015
Action
Reassigned to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
13
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2015
Legislative Date
2/04/2015
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2015
Legislative Date
3/26/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/28/2015 1/29/2015 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/30/2015 1/30/2015 Reassigned to Judicial Proceedings 13
Senate 2/04/2015 2/04/2015 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/25/2015 3/26/2015 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-107, 10-108 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM