Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
St. Mary's County - Local Plumbing Code - Repeal
Sponsored by
Senator Waugh
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 49
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing a provision of law related to the adoption of a plumbing code in St. Mary's County.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0207
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/16/2017
Legislative Date
1/16/2017
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - St. Mary's County - Local Plumbing Code - Repeal
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2017
Legislative Date
1/17/2017
Action
Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2017
Legislative Date
1/30/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2017
Legislative Date
1/31/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
14
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2017
Legislative Date
1/31/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
14
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - St. Mary's County - Local Plumbing Code - Repeal
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2017
Legislative Date
2/02/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
16
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
18
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/22/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2017
Legislative Date
3/25/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/11/2017
Legislative Date
4/11/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 49
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - St. Mary's County - Local Plumbing Code - Repeal
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/16/2017 1/16/2017 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - St. Mary's County - Local Plumbing Code - Repeal
Senate 1/17/2017 1/17/2017 Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/30/2017 1/30/2017 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/31/2017 1/31/2017 Favorable Adopted 14
Senate 1/31/2017 1/31/2017 Second Reading Passed 14
Text - Third - St. Mary's County - Local Plumbing Code - Repeal
Senate 2/02/2017 2/02/2017 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 16
House 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 Referred Economic Matters 18
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/27/2017 3/27/2017 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/27/2017 3/22/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 56
House 3/28/2017 3/23/2017 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 57
Senate 3/29/2017 3/25/2017 Returned Passed 54
Post Passage 4/11/2017 4/11/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 49
Text - Chapter - St. Mary's County - Local Plumbing Code - Repeal
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM