Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Dorchester County – Alcoholic Beverages – Class C Per Diem Licenses – Catering Club Events
Sponsored by
Senator Eckardt
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 57
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Specifying that a holder of a Class C per diem beer license, a Class C per diem beer and wine license, or a Class C per diem beer, wine, and liquor license may cater an event conducted by a club at the place described in the license on certain days.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0298
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2018
Legislative Date
1/12/2018
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2018
Legislative Date
1/17/2018
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2018
Legislative Date
3/08/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2018
Legislative Date
3/08/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2018
Legislative Date
3/08/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2018
Legislative Date
3/10/2018
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
55
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/10/2018
Legislative Date
4/10/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 57
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/12/2018 1/12/2018 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Dorchester County – Alcoholic Beverages – Class C Per Diem Licenses – Catering Club Events
Senate 1/17/2018 1/17/2018 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/08/2018 3/08/2018 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/08/2018 3/08/2018 Favorable Adopted 42
Senate 3/08/2018 3/08/2018 Second Reading Passed 42
Text - Third - Dorchester County – Alcoholic Beverages – Class C Per Diem Licenses – Catering Club Events
Senate 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 44
House 3/13/2018 3/10/2018 Referred Economic Matters 44
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/28/2018 3/28/2018 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/28/2018 3/21/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 55
House 3/29/2018 3/22/2018 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 56
Senate 3/30/2018 3/27/2018 Returned Passed 58
Post Passage 4/10/2018 4/10/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 57
Text - Chapter - Dorchester County – Alcoholic Beverages – Class C Per Diem Licenses – Catering Club Events
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   19-102, 19-1309, 19-1310 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM