Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Property and Casualty Insurance - Premium Finance Companies - Assignment of Rights and Obligations - Repeal of Termination Date
Sponsored by
Senators Pugh, Benson, Conway, Feldman, King, Madaleno, and Nathan-Pulliam
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 16
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing the termination date of specified provisions of law relating to the authority of a premium finance company, with respect to specified motor vehicle insurance, personal insurance, and commercial insurance, to assign rights and obligations under a premium finance agreement and to pledge a premium finance agreement as collateral for a loan.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Economic Matters  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2015
Legislative Date
1/29/2015
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2015
Legislative Date
1/29/2015
Action
Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2015
Legislative Date
2/12/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
22
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
22
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2015
Legislative Date
2/17/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
24
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
26
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2015
Legislative Date
4/08/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/14/2015
Legislative Date
4/14/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 16
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/28/2015 1/29/2015 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/29/2015 1/29/2015 Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/11/2015 2/12/2015 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 2/13/2015 2/13/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 22
Senate 2/13/2015 2/13/2015 Second Reading Passed 22
Senate 2/17/2015 2/17/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 24
House 2/18/2015 2/18/2015 First Reading Economic Matters 26
House 2/18/2015 2/18/2015 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/07/2015 4/08/2015 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 4/08/2015 4/02/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 63
House 4/08/2015 4/02/2015 Second Reading Passed 63
House 4/09/2015 4/03/2015 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 64
Senate 4/10/2015 4/03/2015 Returned Passed 61
Post Passage 4/14/2015 4/14/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 16
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   23-301.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM