Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Anne Arundel County - School Board Nominating Commission - Membership
Sponsored by
Anne Arundel County Senators
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the membership of the School Board Nominating Commission of Anne Arundel County to provide that, beginning July 1, 2016, and every 2 years thereafter, one member shall be appointed by specified chambers of commerce on a rotating basis in a specified order; providing the term of the member appointed by a chamber of commerce is 2 years; and providing for the termination of the term of a specified member of the Commission.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0172
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/14/2016
Legislative Date
1/15/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2016
Legislative Date
1/15/2016
Action
Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/14/2016 1/15/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/15/2016 1/15/2016 Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-110 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM