Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Income Tax Credit - Class F Vehicles - Extension
Sponsored by
Senator McCray
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Synopsis
Extending, from January 1, 2020, to January 1, 2023, the taxable years for which individuals or corporations may claim a State income tax credit for the expense of registering certain qualified vehicles in the State.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0221
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2020
Legislative Date
1/10/2020
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Income Tax Credit - Class F Vehicles - Extension
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2020
Legislative Date
1/10/2020
Action
Hearing 1/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/10/2020 1/10/2020 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Income Tax Credit - Class F Vehicles - Extension
Senate 1/10/2020 1/10/2020 Hearing 1/22 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/19/2020 9:41 AM