Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Wicomico County Board of Education - Election and Appointment of Members
Sponsored by
Senators Mathias and Eckardt
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 169
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Attorney General's Review Letter
Synopsis
Providing for a referendum in November 2016, of the qualified voters of Wicomico County to decide the method for determining the membership of the County Board of Education; requiring the qualified voters of the County to choose to retain the current system of seven members appointed by the Governor, or choose a Board with five members elected by district and two elected at large, or for a Board with five members elected by district and two appointed by the Wicomico County Council; establishing a School Board Nominating Commission; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
Contingency - on a referendum
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/14/2016
Legislative Date
1/15/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2016
Legislative Date
1/15/2016
Action
Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/15/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2016
Legislative Date
2/16/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {384438/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
24
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2016
Legislative Date
2/16/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
24
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2016
Legislative Date
2/18/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
26
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2016
Legislative Date
2/19/2016
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
28
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2016
Legislative Date
3/11/2016
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/26/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {195165/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/26/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (135-1)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendment
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/26/2016
Legislative Date
4/26/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 169
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/14/2016 1/15/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/15/2016 1/15/2016 Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/12/2016 2/15/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/16/2016 2/16/2016 Favorable with Amendments {384438/1 Report Adopted 24
Senate 2/16/2016 2/16/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 24
Senate 2/18/2016 2/18/2016 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 26
House 2/19/2016 2/19/2016 First Reading Ways and Means 28
House 3/11/2016 3/11/2016 Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/30/2016 3/31/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/31/2016 3/26/2016 Favorable with Amendments {195165/1 Report Adopted 58
House 3/31/2016 3/26/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 58
House 4/01/2016 3/27/2016 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (135-1) 59
Senate 4/04/2016 3/29/2016 Senate Concur - House Amendment 58
Senate 4/04/2016 3/29/2016 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 58
Senate 4/04/2016 3/29/2016 Passed Enrolled 58
Post Passage 4/26/2016 4/26/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 169
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-105, 3-114, 3-13A-01 through 3-13A-06 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM