Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Congressional Districting Process
Sponsored by
Senators Pinsky and Smith
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Legislative Services to obtain specified census data, adjust the census data for specified purposes, and provide the census data to a temporary redistricting commission within 30 days after the Department has finished adjusting the census data; requiring the commission to use specified census data to prepare and adopt a districting plan for congressional districts within 90 days after the commission members are appointed or the census data is received by the Commission, whichever is later; etc.
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0474 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Contingency - on a contingency described in Sec. 2 of the bill
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/16/2017
Legislative Date
1/16/2017
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/16/2017
Legislative Date
1/16/2017
Action
Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Congressional Districting Process
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2017
Legislative Date
1/17/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2017
Legislative Date
1/17/2017
Action
Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/18/2017
Legislative Date
1/18/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2017
Legislative Date
2/13/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/16/2017 1/16/2017 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/16/2017 1/16/2017 Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Congressional Districting Process
Senate 1/17/2017 1/17/2017 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/17/2017 1/17/2017 Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/18/2017 1/18/2017 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 Hearing canceled
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/13/2017 2/13/2017 Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   8-6A-01 through 8-6A-04 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM