Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Commercial Driver's Licenses - Recognition, Prevention, and Reporting of Human Trafficking
Sponsored by
Senators Klausmeier, Lee, Smith, Washington, and West
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 233
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring commercial driver's license training schools to include training on the recognition, prevention, and effective reporting of human trafficking as part of the curriculum; requiring the Motor Vehicle Administration to include content on the recognition, prevention, and effective reporting of human trafficking in its Commercial Driver's License Manual; and requiring the Administration to provide to an applicant renewing a commercial driver's license certain information from the Manual.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0005
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0701 Session: 2018 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2019
Legislative Date
1/21/2019
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2019
Legislative Date
1/22/2019
Action
Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {278079/1
Proceedings
19A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
Committee Amendment Adopted
Proceedings
19A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until 2/6 (Senator Jennings) Adopted
Proceedings
19A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2019
Legislative Date
2/07/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Adopted
Proceedings
21
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2019
Legislative Date
2/07/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {753222/2 (Senator Jennings) Adopted
Proceedings
21
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2019
Legislative Date
2/07/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
21
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
23
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2019
Legislative Date
2/12/2019
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
25
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/19/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {580513/1 Adopted
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/19/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/22/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
62A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
62A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/30/2019
Legislative Date
4/30/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 233
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/21/2019 1/21/2019 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Commercial Driver's Licenses - Recognition, Prevention, and Reporting of Human Trafficking
Senate 1/22/2019 1/22/2019 Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2019 2/04/2019 Favorable with Amendments {278079/1 19A
Senate 2/05/2019 2/04/2019 Committee Amendment Adopted 19A
Senate 2/05/2019 2/04/2019 Motion Special Order until 2/6 (Senator Jennings) Adopted 19A
Senate 2/07/2019 2/07/2019 Favorable with Amendments Adopted 21
Senate 2/07/2019 2/07/2019 Floor Amendment {753222/2 (Senator Jennings) Adopted 21
Senate 2/07/2019 2/07/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 21
Text - Third - Commercial Driver's Licenses - Recognition, Prevention, and Reporting of Human Trafficking
Senate 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 23
House 2/12/2019 2/12/2019 Referred Environment and Transportation 25
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/27/2019 3/27/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/27/2019 3/19/2019 Favorable with Amendments {580513/1 Adopted 54
House 3/27/2019 3/19/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 54
House 4/01/2019 3/22/2019 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 57
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Senate Concurs House Amendments 62A
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 62A
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Commercial Driver's Licenses - Recognition, Prevention, and Reporting of Human Trafficking
Post Passage 4/30/2019 4/30/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 233
Text - Chapter - Commercial Driver's Licenses - Recognition, Prevention, and Reporting of Human Trafficking
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   16-807.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM