Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law – Kratom – Prohibited Purchase, Distribution, or Sale
Sponsored by
Senator Young
Status
In the House - Hearing canceled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from purchasing for, distributing, or selling kratom to an individual under the age of 18 years of age, except under certain circumstances; providing it is a defense in a prosecution under the Act that the defendant examined the purchaser's driver's license or other valid identification that positively identified the purchaser or recipient as at least 18 years of age; establishing that a violation of the Act is a civil penalty; providing for the issuance and prosecution of a civil citation issued under the Act; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0283
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2020
Legislative Date
1/10/2020
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Criminal Law - Kratom - Prohibition
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2020
Legislative Date
1/13/2020
Action
Hearing 1/22 at 3:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2020
Legislative Date
2/04/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {618874/1
Proceedings
20 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2020
Legislative Date
2/04/2020
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Hershey) Adopted
Proceedings
20 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {618874/1 Adopted
Proceedings
21 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
21 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Criminal Law – Kratom – Prohibited Purchase, Distribution, or Sale
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (35-11)
Proceedings
23 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/10/2020 1/10/2020 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Criminal Law - Kratom - Prohibition
Senate 1/13/2020 1/13/2020 Hearing 1/22 at 3:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2020 2/04/2020 Favorable with Amendments {618874/1 20 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/04/2020 2/04/2020 Motion Laid Over (Senator Hershey) Adopted 20 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 Favorable with Amendments {618874/1 Adopted 21 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 21 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Criminal Law – Kratom – Prohibited Purchase, Distribution, or Sale
Senate 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 Third Reading Passed (35-11) 23 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Referred Judiciary 24 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/12/2020 3/12/2020 Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/14/2020 3/14/2020 Hearing canceled
(   5-402 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:52 PM
Click to return on the top page