Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Juvenile Law - Citations for Violations
Sponsored by
Senator Simonaire
Status
In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Adding specified offenses to the list of offenses for which a law enforcement officer authorized to make arrests is required to issue a citation to a child under specified circumstances; and altering a specified definition.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/14/2016
Legislative Date
1/15/2016
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2016
Legislative Date
1/15/2016
Action
Hearing 1/28 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/15/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/14/2016 1/15/2016 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/15/2016 1/15/2016 Hearing 1/28 at 1:30 p.m.
Senate 2/12/2016 2/15/2016 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
(   3-8A-01, 3-8A-10, 3-8A-19, 3-8A-33 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page