Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Dorchester County - Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Containers
Sponsored by
Senator Colburn
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 446
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Creating in Dorchester County a refillable container license; authorizing the Board of License Commissioners to issue the license to holders of specified alcoholic beverages licenses; specifying that a holder of the refillable container license may sell draft beer for consumption off the licensed premises in a specified refillable container; prohibiting a holder of a refillable container license to display or provide shelving for beer for off-premises consumption; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0133
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/16/2013
Legislative Date
1/17/2013
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2013
Legislative Date
1/30/2013
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2013
Legislative Date
2/18/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2013
Legislative Date
2/19/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
28
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2013
Legislative Date
2/19/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
28
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2013
Legislative Date
2/21/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2013
Legislative Date
2/22/2013
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
33
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2013
Legislative Date
3/25/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2013
Legislative Date
3/25/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/27/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/16/2013
Legislative Date
5/16/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 446
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/16/2013 1/17/2013 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/30/2013 1/30/2013 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/18/2013 2/18/2013 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/19/2013 2/19/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 28
Senate 2/19/2013 2/19/2013 Second Reading Passed 28
Senate 2/21/2013 2/21/2013 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 30
House 2/22/2013 2/22/2013 First Reading Economic Matters 33
House 3/28/2013 3/29/2013 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/29/2013 3/25/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 58
House 3/29/2013 3/25/2013 Second Reading Passed 58
House 4/02/2013 3/27/2013 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 60
Senate 4/03/2013 3/29/2013 Returned Passed 60
Post Passage 5/16/2013 5/16/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 446
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM