Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Occupations - Athletic Trainers Act - Revisions
Sponsored by
Senators Bates and Smith
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "practice athletic training"; altering the composition of the Athletic Trainer Advisory Committee; specifying that certain members of the Committee may be appointed from a certain list of individuals submitted to the State Board of Physicians by a certain successor organization; requiring a licensed athletic trainer to practice athletic training in accordance with standards of practice established by certain organizations; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0497
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2018
Legislative Date
1/12/2018
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Health Occupations - Athletic Trainers Act - Revisions
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2018
Legislative Date
1/17/2018
Action
Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/12/2018 1/12/2018 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Health Occupations - Athletic Trainers Act - Revisions
Senate 1/17/2018 1/17/2018 Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-5D-01, 14-5D-04, 14-5D-05, 14-5D-07, 14-5D-10, 14-5D-11 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM