Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Motor Vehicle Insurance - Task Force to Study Methods to Reduce the Rate of Uninsured Drivers
Sponsored by
Senators Middleton, Kittleman, Pugh, Brinkley, Feldman, Glassman, Kelley, Klausmeier, Mathias, and Ramirez
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 41
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Task Force to Study Methods to Reduce the Rate of Uninsured Drivers; providing for the composition, cochairs, and staffing of the Task Force; prohibiting a member of the Task Force from receiving specified compensation, but authorizing the reimbursement of specified expenses; requiring the Task Force to study and make recommendations, including those regarding the rate of uninsured drivers in the State and in other states and the ways in which the rate is calculated in Maryland; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: HB0130
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2014
Legislative Date
1/13/2014
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/14/2014
Legislative Date
1/14/2014
Action
Hearing 1/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2014
Legislative Date
1/27/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2014
Legislative Date
1/27/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {357073/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
13
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2014
Legislative Date
1/27/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
13
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2014
Legislative Date
1/29/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (41-0)
Proceedings
15
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2014
Legislative Date
1/30/2014
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
17
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/23/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/23/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/23/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/08/2014
Legislative Date
4/08/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 41
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/13/2014 1/13/2014 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/14/2014 1/14/2014 Hearing 1/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/27/2014 1/27/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 1/27/2014 1/27/2014 Favorable with Amendments {357073/1 Report Adopted 13
Senate 1/27/2014 1/27/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 13
Senate 1/29/2014 1/29/2014 Third Reading Passed (41-0) 15
House 1/30/2014 1/30/2014 First Reading Economic Matters 17
House 3/27/2014 3/28/2014 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/28/2014 3/23/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 59
House 3/28/2014 3/23/2014 Second Reading Passed 59
House 3/31/2014 3/24/2014 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 60
Senate 4/01/2014 3/23/2014 Returned Passed 57
Post Passage 4/08/2014 4/08/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 41
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM