Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Drivers' Licenses, Identification Cards, and Moped Operators' Permits - Enhanced Identification Documents
Sponsored by
Senator Reilly
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Motor Vehicle Administration to make available to an applicant for a driver's license, an identification card, or a moped operator's permit the opportunity to upgrade to an enhanced identification document; establishing that the Administration may issue an enhanced identification document to individuals who provide proof of identity, State residence, and United States' citizenship; requiring an individual who applies for such an identification document to provide to the Administration a biometric identifier; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0732
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0787 Session: 2015 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/14/2016
Legislative Date
1/15/2016
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2016
Legislative Date
1/20/2016
Action
Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2016
Legislative Date
2/08/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/14/2016 1/15/2016 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/20/2016 1/20/2016 Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/05/2016 2/08/2016 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-305 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM