Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Schools - Length of School Year Adjustment - State of Emergency
Sponsored by
Senators King, DeGrange, Feldman, Guzzone, Kagan, Lee, Madaleno, Manno, Peters, Smith, Young, and Zucker
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a county board of education to adjust the length of the school year for up to 5 school days without applying for a specified waiver if normal school attendance is prevented because of conditions that require the Governor to declare a state of emergency; and prohibiting education funding from specified sources from being reduced under specified circumstances.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/16/2017
Legislative Date
1/16/2017
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Schools - Length of School Year Adjustment - State of Emergency
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2017
Legislative Date
1/17/2017
Action
Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2017
Legislative Date
1/20/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2017
Legislative Date
1/20/2017
Action
Hearing 2/01 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2017
Legislative Date
2/23/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2017
Legislative Date
2/24/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
31
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Public Schools - Length of School Year Adjustment - State of Emergency
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2017
Legislative Date
2/28/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
33
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2017
Legislative Date
3/01/2017
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
36
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2017
Legislative Date
3/08/2017
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/16/2017 1/16/2017 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Public Schools - Length of School Year Adjustment - State of Emergency
Senate 1/17/2017 1/17/2017 Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/20/2017 1/20/2017 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/20/2017 1/20/2017 Hearing 2/01 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/23/2017 2/23/2017 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/24/2017 2/24/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 31
Text - Third - Public Schools - Length of School Year Adjustment - State of Emergency
Senate 2/28/2017 2/28/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 33
House 3/01/2017 3/01/2017 Referred Ways and Means 36
House 3/08/2017 3/08/2017 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-103 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM